GA SB365 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Act 562
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, so as to revise, modernize, correct errors or omissions in, and reenact the statutory portion of said Code, as amended, in furtherance of the work of the Code Revision Commission; to repeal portions of said Code, or Acts in amendment thereof, which have become obsolete, have been declared to be unconstitutional, or have been preempted or superseded by subsequent laws; to codify principles of law derived from decisions of the state Supreme Court; to provide for other matters relating to revision, reenactment, and publication of said Code; to provide for effect in event of conflicts; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Code Revision Commission; statutory portion of said Code; revise, modernize, correct errors or omissions in and reenact

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-23 - House - House Vote #755 (Y: 154 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #484 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08 Act 562
2018-05-08SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2018-04-05SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2018-03-23HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2018-03-23HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-03-12HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2018-02-23HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-02-22HouseHouse First Readers
2018-02-21SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2018-02-21SenateSenate Third Read
2018-02-07SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-02-06SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2018-01-31SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-01-30SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback