GA SB363 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-8)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-8)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 2 of Article 15 of Chapter 1 of Title 10 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the "Fair Business Practices Act of 1975," so as to provide for class action suits and for damages for violating the requirements for solicitations for corporate filings or employment or labor related posters or notices; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
"Fair Business Practices Act of 1975,"; class action suits and for damages for violating the requirements for solicitations for corporate filings; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - House - Passage: House Vote #810 (Y: 169 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #478 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #478 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-02 | Effective Date 2022-07-01 | |
2022-05-02 | Act 791 | |
2022-05-02 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2022-03-30 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2022-03-30 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-03-23 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-10 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-02-08 | House | House First Readers |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Senate Hopper |