GA SB363 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 21 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to elections and primaries generally, so as to provide for the time for opening and closing of the polls; to provide for the tabulation of advance voting ballots in the same manner as absentee votes under certain circumstances; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections and Primaries; time for opening and closing of the polls; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #495 (Y: 32 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-15HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-02-28HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-02-26HouseHouse First Readers
2018-02-23SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-02-23SenateSenate Third Read
2018-02-23SenateSenate Engrossed
2018-02-21SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-02-20SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-01-30SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-01-29SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback