GA SB360 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-24 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Judiciary - Non-Civil Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-24 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Judiciary - Non-Civil Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 16-5-102 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to exploitation and intimidation of disabled adults, elder persons, and residents, and obstruction of investigation, so as to enact "Colton's Law"; to provide a short title; to provide for the protections for disabled minors; to amend Title 42 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to penal institutions, so as to amend cross references; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
"Colton's Law"; enact
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-17 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #526 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-24 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-02-22 | House | House First Readers |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Senate Hopper |