GA SB358 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-12 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 60 of Title 36 and Code Section 45-8-14 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions relative to provisions applicable to counties and municipal corporations and depositories for county and school district moneys, respectively, so as to provide for the establishment of banking improvement zones to encourage opening of financial institutions in areas underserved by financial institutions; to provide for definitions; to provide for application and standards of approval for a banking improvement zone; to provide for the establishment of an agreement for the deposit of public funds in financial institutions within a banking improvement zone; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Counties/Municipal Corporations; establishment of banking improvement zones; agreement for deposit of public funds; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #557 (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-12HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2018-03-05HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-03-01HouseHouse First Readers
2018-02-28SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-02-28SenateSenate Third Read
2018-02-22SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-02-21SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-01-29SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-01-25SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback