GA SB357 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Veto V21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 31 of the O.C.G.A., relating to health, so as to create the Health Coordination and Innovation Council of the State of Georgia; to amend other provisions of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated so as to provide for conforming changes; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Coordination and Innovation Council of the State of Georgia; create

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #768 (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Vote #710 (Y: 153 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #428 (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08 Veto V21
2018-05-08SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2018-04-05SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2018-03-29SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub
2018-03-15HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-03-15HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-03-14HouseHouse Postponed
2018-03-09HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-02-12HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-02-08HouseHouse First Readers
2018-02-07SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-02-07SenateSenate Third Read
2018-02-06SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-02-05SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-01-29SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-01-25SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback