GA SB355 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-30 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-30 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 2 of Title 21 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions regarding elections and primaries, so as to prohibit the use of ranked-choice voting; to provide for certain exceptions; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Elections and Primaries; use of ranked-choice voting; prohibit
Sponsors
Sen. Randy Robertson [R] | Sen. Max Burns [R] | Sen. Ricky Williams [R] | Sen. Jason Anavitarte [R] |
Sen. Greg Dolezal [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-26 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #435 (Y: 31 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - Senate - Motion To Engross: Sb 358, Sb 355: Senate Vote #431 (Y: 29 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - Senate - Motion To Engross: Sb 358, Sb 355: Senate Vote #431 (Y: 29 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-30 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-01-29 | House | House First Readers |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Senate Hopper |