GA SB354 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 20-4-21 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to tuition fees, so as to require that the Technical College System of Georgia classify certain active duty service members as in-state for tuition purposes; to provide for a definition; to require reporting; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Technical College System of Georgia; classify certain active duty service members as in-state for tuition purposes; require

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #568 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-21HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-03-05HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-03-01HouseHouse First Readers
2018-02-28SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-02-28SenateSenate Third Read
2018-02-08SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-02-07SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-01-25SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-01-24SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback