GA SB352 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-02-12 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 1 of Title 31 of the O.C.G.A., relating to general provisions relative to health, so as to prohibit patient brokering;to create a director of Substance Abuse, Addiction, and Related Disorders; to provide for appointment; to provide for qualifications; to establish the Commission on Substance Abuse and Recovery; to provide for membership; to provide for duties; to amend Chapter 1 of Title 33 of the O.C.G.A., relating to general provisions relative to insurance, so as to provide for a fraudulent insurance act for the excessive, high-tech, or fraudulent drug testing of certain individuals; to provide for investigation by the Commissioner; to provide for penalties; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health; general provisions; patient brokering; prohibit; Commission on Substance Abuse and Recovery; establish; fraudulent insurance act; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #427 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-12HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-02-08HouseHouse First Readers
2018-02-07SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-02-07SenateSenate Third Read
2018-02-06SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-02-05SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-01-25SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-01-24SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback