GA SB350 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Act 353
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 33-39-5 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to transactions requiring notice of information practices, form and content of notice, abbreviated notice, and satisfaction of obligations by another institution or agent, so as to update notice practices requirements by an insurance institution or agent to applicants or policyholders in the case of policy renewal to comport with federal law; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Notice of Information Practices By Institution or Agent; policy renewal to comport with federal law; update notice practices requirements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-21 - House - House Vote #734 (Y: 165 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #508 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-03 Act 353
2018-05-03SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2018-04-05SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2018-03-21HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2018-03-21HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-03-09HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2018-03-01HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-02-28HouseHouse First Readers
2018-02-26SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-02-26SenateSenate Third Read
2018-02-23SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-02-22SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-01-25SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-01-24SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback