GA SB350 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Act 353
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Act 353
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 33-39-5 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to transactions requiring notice of information practices, form and content of notice, abbreviated notice, and satisfaction of obligations by another institution or agent, so as to update notice practices requirements by an insurance institution or agent to applicants or policyholders in the case of policy renewal to comport with federal law; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Notice of Information Practices By Institution or Agent; policy renewal to comport with federal law; update notice practices requirements
Sponsors
Sen. Larry Walker [R] | Sen. Burt Jones [R] | Sen. David Shafer [R] | Sen. Ed Harbison [D] |
Sen. P.K. Martin [R] | Sen. Frank Ginn [R] | Rep. Shaw Blackmon [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-21 - House - House Vote #734 (Y: 165 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #508 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #508 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | Act 353 | |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2018-03-21 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2018-03-21 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-03-09 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-03-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-28 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Senate Hopper |