GA SB346 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 50 of Title 43 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the State Board of Veterinary Medicine, so as to increase the membership of the State Board of Veterinary Medicine and authorize a registered veterinary technician member; to provide for a professional health program for impaired veterinarians; to provide for definitions; to provide for confidentiality of certain records; to provide for costs; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
State Board of Veterinary Medicine; membership; increase; registered veterinary technician member; authorize
Sponsors
Sen. Ellis Black [R] | Sen. Dean Burke [R] | Sen. Lee Anderson [R] | Sen. Sally Harrell [D] |
Sen. Chuck Payne [R] | Rep. Clay Pirkle [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-19 - House - House Vote #673 (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 37) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #520 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #520 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-01 | Effective Date | |
2020-07-29 | Act 514 | |
2020-07-29 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2020-06-19 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-19 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-06-17 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-03-05 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-03-04 | House | House First Readers |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Senate Hopper |