GA SB345 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-05 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 26 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to standards, labeling, and adulteration of food, so as to provide for nonprofit organizations to prepare and provide food in accordance with Department of Public Health requirements; to revise the definitions of "food sales establishment" and "food service establishment"; to revise provisions relating to permits for nonprofit food sales and food service; to revise requirements for food items prepared by nonprofit organizations; to eliminate the right to appeal to the commissioner of public health for orders or actions of a county board of health or district health director; to correct a cross-reference; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Standards, Labeling, and Adulteration of Food; nonprofit organizations to prepare in accordance with Department of Public Health requirements; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-15 - House - House Vote #646 (Y: 150 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #471 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-05 Effective Date
2020-08-05 Act 591
2020-08-05SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2020-06-29SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2020-06-15HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2020-06-15HouseHouse Third Readers
2020-03-02HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2020-02-24HouseHouse Second Readers
2020-02-21HouseHouse First Readers
2020-02-20SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2020-02-20SenateSenate Third Read
2020-02-19SenateSenate Read Second Time
2020-02-18SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2020-02-03SenateSenate Read and Referred
2020-01-31SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback