GA SB344 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-24 - House Lost Reconsidered Bill/Resolution
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-24 - House Lost Reconsidered Bill/Resolution
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 24-13-60 of the O.C.G.A., relating to order requiring prisoner's delivery to serve as witness or criminal defendant generally, expenses, and prisoner under death sentence as witness, so as to provide that certain proceedings may be conducted by video conference; to amend Article 6 of Chapter 3 of Title 35 of the O.C.G.A., relating to Division of Forensic Sciences, so as to provide that employees of the state crime lab or associated laboratories may appear by video teleconference in certain proceedings in court; to provide for requirements for such appearances; to provide for notice and continuances; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Witness or Criminal Defendant; certain proceedings conducted by video conference; requirements; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] | Sen. Michael Dugan [R] | Sen. Steve Gooch [R] |
Sen. John Kennedy [R] | Sen. Larry Walker [R] | Rep. Chuck Efstration [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-24 - House - House Vote #711 (Y: 82 N: 82 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2020-06-24 - House - House Vote #712 (Y: 94 N: 71 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Vote #713 (Y: 81 N: 68 NV: 15 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Vote #553 (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Vote #712 (Y: 94 N: 71 NV: 2 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - House - House Vote #713 (Y: 81 N: 68 NV: 15 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Vote #553 (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-24 | House | House Lost Reconsidered Bill/Resolution |
2020-06-24 | House | House Reconsidered |
2020-06-24 | House | House Third Reading Lost |
2020-06-24 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-06-18 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-03-12 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-03-10 | House | House First Readers |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Senate Hopper |