GA SB339 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Act 557
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 3 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the board of regents and university system, so as to provide for the establishment of free speech policies for institutions of the university system; to provide for a cause of action and remedies; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Board of Regents and University System; establishment of free speech policies for institutions of the university system; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #799 (Y: 34 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Vote #767 (Y: 110 N: 57 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #524 (Y: 32 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08 Act 557
2018-05-08SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2018-04-05SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2018-03-29SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub
2018-03-27HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-03-27HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-03-15HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-03-01HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-02-28HouseHouse First Readers
2018-02-26SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-02-26SenateSenate Third Read
2018-02-22SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-02-21SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-01-22SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-01-19SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback