GA SB338 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 22-4)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 22-4)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 7 of Chapter 4 of Title 49 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to medical assistance generally, so as to increase postpartum coverage under Medicaid from six months to one year following birth; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Medicaid; postpartum coverage under Medicaid from six months to one year following birth; increase
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - House - Passage: House Vote #892 (Y: 142 N: 18 NV: 8 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #476 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #476 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-13 | Effective Date 2022-07-01 | |
2022-05-13 | Act 870 | |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2022-04-04 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2022-04-04 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-04-04 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-03-25 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2022-03-23 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-10 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-02-08 | House | House First Readers |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Senate Hopper |