GA SB338 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Veto V19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 13 of Title 50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions for administrative procedure, so as to modify requirements for agency rule making; to modify legislative objections to and staying of proposed agency rules; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Administrative Procedure; agency rule making; modify requirements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - House - House Vote #853 (Y: 150 N: 16 NV: 12 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Vote #770 (Y: 173 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate Vote #432 (Y: 36 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08 Veto V19
2018-05-08SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2018-04-05SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2018-03-29HouseHouse Receded from Amend or Sub
2018-03-29SenateSenate Disagreed House Amend or Sub
2018-03-27HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-03-27HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-03-15HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-02-13HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-02-12HouseHouse First Readers
2018-02-08SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-02-08SenateSenate Third Read
2018-02-05SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-02-01SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-01-22SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-01-19SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback