GA SB337 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-13 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 5 of Title 45 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to vacation of office, so as to provide for the suspension of compensation for certain public officers who are suspended because of indictment for a felony; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Public Officers; suspension of compensation because of indictment for a felony; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-01 - Senate - Agree To House Substitute: Senate Vote #778 (Y: 47 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - House - Passage: House Vote #790 (Y: 149 N: 4 NV: 10 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #570 (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - House - Passage: House Vote #790 (Y: 149 N: 4 NV: 10 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #570 (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-13 | Effective Date 2022-07-01 | |
2022-05-13 | Act 869 | |
2022-05-13 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2022-03-28 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-03-28 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-03-25 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-03-04 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-03-03 | House | House First Readers |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-01-14 | Senate | Senate Hopper |