GA SB331 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-07 - Act 445
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 27 of Title 50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions regarding the Georgia Lottery for Education Act, so as to allow a winner of a lottery prize to remain anonymous under certain conditions; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Georgia Lottery for Education Act; winner of lottery prize to remain anonymous under certain conditions; allow

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #800 (Y: 49 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - House Vote #726 (Y: 173 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #418 (Y: 50 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-07 Act 445
2018-05-07SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2018-04-05SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2018-03-29SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub
2018-03-19HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-03-19HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-03-07HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-02-07HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-02-06HouseHouse First Readers
2018-02-05SenateSenate Passed/Adopted As Amended
2018-02-05SenateSenate Third Read
2018-02-01SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-01-31SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2018-01-19SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-01-18SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback