GA SB328 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to authorize the governing authority of the City of Jackson to levy an excise tax pursuant to subsection (b) of Code Section 48-13-51 of the O.C.G.A.; to provide for procedures, conditions, and limitations; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Jackson, City of; levy an excise tax pursuant to subsection (b) of Code Section 48-13-51 of the O.C.G.A.; authorize the governing authority
Sponsors
Sen. Burt Jones [R] | Rep. Susan Holmes [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-25 - House - House Vote #759 (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate Vote #444 (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - Senate - Senate Vote #444 (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Effective Date | |
2020-06-29 | Act 393 | |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2020-06-25 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-25 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-06-25 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-04 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-02-03 | House | House First Readers |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Senate Hopper |