GA SB328 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Act 292
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 7 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to imposition, rate, computation, and exemptions from state income tax, so as to provide for the expiration of certain income tax credits; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income Tax; expiration of certain income tax credits; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #659 (Y: 44 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - House Vote #722 (Y: 139 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate Vote #431 (Y: 46 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-27 Act 292
2018-03-27SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2018-03-26SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2018-03-21SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub
2018-03-19HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-03-19HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-03-15HouseHouse Postponed
2018-03-09HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-02-13HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-02-12HouseHouse First Readers
2018-02-08SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2018-02-08SenateSenate Third Read
2018-02-08SenateSenate Engrossed
2018-01-29SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-01-25SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2018-01-18SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-01-16SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback