GA SB328 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Act 292
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-27 - Act 292
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 7 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to imposition, rate, computation, and exemptions from state income tax, so as to provide for the expiration of certain income tax credits; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Income Tax; expiration of certain income tax credits; provide
Sponsors
Sen. John Albers [R] | Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] | Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] | Sen. Jack Hill [R] |
Sen. Ben Watson [R] | Sen. Lindsey Tippins [R] | Rep. Brett Harrell [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #659 (Y: 44 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - House Vote #722 (Y: 139 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate Vote #431 (Y: 46 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - House Vote #722 (Y: 139 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate Vote #431 (Y: 46 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Act 292 | |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2018-03-19 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-03-19 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-03-15 | House | House Postponed |
2018-03-09 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-02-13 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-12 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Senate Hopper |