GA SB327 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-13 - House First Readers
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 1 of Title 34 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions regarding labor and industrial relations, so as to require employers to provide reasonable break time to an employee who needs to express breast milk for her nursing child; to revise and to provide for definitions; to provide for requirements; to provide for a cause of action against employers for violations; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Labor and Industrial Relations; employers to provide reasonable break time to employee to express breast milk for nursing child; require

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #600 (Y: 49 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #636 (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #637 (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-13HouseHouse First Readers
2020-03-12SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2020-03-12SenateSenate Third Read
2020-03-12SenateSenate Taken from Table
2020-03-12SenateSenate Tabled
2020-03-02SenateSenate Read Second Time
2020-02-28SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2020-01-29SenateSenate Read and Referred
2020-01-28SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback