GA SB325 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - House Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 34 of Title 43 of the O.C.G.A., relating to physicians, assistants, and others, so as to enter into an interstate compact known as the "Interstate Medical Licensure Compact Act"; to authorize the Georgia Composite Medical Board to administer the compact in this state; to provide for the purpose of the compact; to provide definitions; to provide for eligibility; to provide for application of an expedited license; to provide for a coordinated information system; to provide for joint investigations and discipline; to provide for a commission to administer the compact among the member states; to provide for dispute resolution; to provide for withdrawal from the compact; to provide for construction; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
"Interstate Medical Licensure Compact Act"; Georgia Composite Medical Board to administer the compact in this state; authorize
Sponsors
Sen. Kay Kirkpatrick [R] | Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] | Sen. Dean Burke [R] | Sen. Ben Watson [R] |
Sen. Blake Tillery [R] | Sen. Joshua McKoon [R] | Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - House - House Vote #784 (Y: 153 N: 13 NV: 8 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #518 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #518 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-03-27 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-03-15 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-03-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-28 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Senate Hopper |