GA SB319 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 32-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-12 - Effective Date 2022-04-12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 32-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-12 - Effective Date 2022-04-12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 3 of Title 12 of the O.C.G.A., relating to general provisions regarding parks, historic areas, memorials, and recreation; to amend Part 3 of Article 4 of Chapter 11 of Title 16 of the O.C.G.A., relating to carrying and possession of firearms; to amend Part 2 of Article 4 of Chapter 12 of Title 16 of the O.C.G.A., relating to transportation passenger safety; to amend Title 27 of the O.C.G.A., relating to game and fish, so as to revise certain laws regarding the carrying of firearms; to amend Part 2 of Article 10 of Chapter 6 of Title 40 of the O.C.G.A., relating to parking for persons with disabilities; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
"Georgia Constitutional Carry Act of 2021"; enact
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-01 - Senate - Agree To House Substitute: Senate Vote #783 (Y: 34 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - Reconsider: House Vote #818 (Y: 65 N: 101 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2022-03-30 - House - Passage: House Vote #817 (Y: 100 N: 67 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - Table: House Vote #816 (Y: 66 N: 101 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #565 (Y: 34 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Adoption Of Amendment #1 By The Senator From The 48th: Senate Vote #564 (Y: 22 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-30 - House - Reconsider: House Vote #818 (Y: 65 N: 101 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2022-03-30 - House - Passage: House Vote #817 (Y: 100 N: 67 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - Table: House Vote #816 (Y: 66 N: 101 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #565 (Y: 34 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Adoption Of Amendment #1 By The Senator From The 48th: Senate Vote #564 (Y: 22 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-12 | Effective Date 2022-04-12 | |
2022-04-12 | Act 596 | |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2022-03-30 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-03-30 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-03-30 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-03-25 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-03-03 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-03-01 | House | House First Readers |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Hopper |