GA SB319 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-26 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Natural Resources and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 3 of Article 5 of Chapter 5 of Title 12 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to rivers and river basins relative to dam safety, so as to prohibit the building of inhabitable structures in the inundation zone of a Category II dam without prior certification from an engineer of record; to provide for an engineer of record to perform and certify a breach analysis where inhabitable structures already exist in the inundation zone of a Category II dam; to provide for filing of the certified breach analysis; to provide for the development of building standards for inhabitable structures in the inundation zone of a Category II dam; to provide for definitions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rivers and River Basins; dam safety; building of inhabitable structures in the inundation zone of Category II; prohibit

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #482 (Y: 47 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-26HouseHouse Second Readers
2020-02-25HouseHouse First Readers
2020-02-24SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2020-02-24SenateSenate Third Read
2020-02-18SenateSenate Read Second Time
2020-02-05SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2020-01-29SenateSenate Read and Referred
2020-01-28SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback