GA SB319 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 43-10A-3 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to definitions relative to professional counselors, social workers, and others, so as to revise the definition of "professional counseling"; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Professional Counseling; revise the definition

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-03-24 - House - House Vote #846 (Y: 145 N: 26 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #810 (Y: 47 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - Senate - Senate Vote #457 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-26 Effective Date
2016-04-26 Act 377
2016-04-26SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2016-03-31SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2016-03-24SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub
2016-03-24HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2016-03-24HouseHouse Third Readers
2016-03-22HouseHouse Postponed
2016-03-16HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2016-02-19HouseHouse Second Readers
2016-02-18HouseHouse First Readers
2016-02-17SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2016-02-17SenateSenate Third Read
2016-02-16SenateSenate Read Second Time
2016-02-11SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2016-02-03SenateSenate Read and Referred
2016-02-02SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback