GA SB318 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-05 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 37 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to mental health, so as to provide for the execution of a physician's certificate for emergency examination of a person for involuntary evaluation and treatment for mental illness or alcohol or drug abuse based on consultation with an emergency medical technician or paramedic who has personally observed the person; to provide for immunity; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mental Health; involuntary evaluation and treatment based on consultation with paramedic; execution of a physician's certificate for emergency examination; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #540 (Y: 53 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-05HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-03-01HouseHouse First Readers
2018-02-28SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-02-28SenateSenate Third Read
2018-02-26SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-02-23SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-01-11SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-01-10SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback