GA SB315 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on August 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 3 of Article 8 of Chapter 14 of Title 44 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to mechanics and materialmen, so as to provide that a waiver and release of lien and bond rights shall only be applicable to the issues of the waiver and release and shall not affect any other rights or remedies available under the law; to revise language and appearance requirements of statutory forms; to revise procedures; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Mechanics and Materialmen; waiver and release of lien and bond rights/other remedies under the law; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Lindsey Tippins [R] | Sen. Michael Dugan [R] | Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] | Sen. Jesse Stone [R] |
Sen. William Ligon [R] | Sen. Jack Hill [R] | Rep. Dale Washburn [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-19 - House - House Vote #668 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #474 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - Senate - Senate Vote #474 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-01 | Effective Date | |
2020-08-05 | Act 576 | |
2020-08-05 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2020-06-19 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-19 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-06-17 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-02-25 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-02-24 | House | House First Readers |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Senate Hopper |