GA SB315 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Veto V18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Veto V18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 1 of Article 6 of Chapter 9 of Title 16 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to computer crimes, so as to create the new crime of unauthorized computer access; to provide for penalties; to change provisions relating to venue for computer crimes; to provide for forfeiture; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Computer Crimes; create a new crime of unauthorized computer access; penalties; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Bruce Thompson [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] | Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] |
Sen. Renee Unterman [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Rep. Christian Coomer [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #816 (Y: 41 N: 7 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Vote #785 (Y: 107 N: 63 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #436 (Y: 20 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #437 (Y: 40 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Vote #785 (Y: 107 N: 63 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #436 (Y: 20 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #437 (Y: 40 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Veto V18 | |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2018-03-27 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-03-27 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-03-23 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-02-15 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2018-02-14 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-13 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Senate Hopper |