GA SB312 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-22 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-22 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to state government, so as to create the Georgia Commission on African American History and Culture; to provide for duties and objectives; to provide for membership and terms of office; to provide for reporting; to provide for funding; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Commission on African American History and Culture; create
Sponsors
Sen. Lester Jackson [D] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] | Sen. Michael Dugan [R] | Sen. Emanuel Jones [D] |
Rep. Miriam Paris [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #519 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-03-05 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-03-04 | House | House First Readers |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senate Hopper |