GA SB31 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 31 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Department of Community Health, so as to provide that at least two members of the board shall also be members of the state health benefit plan; to provide that two members shall be members of certain retirement systems; to provide for duties of the Board of Community Health; to create the State Health Benefit Plan Customer Advisory Council; to provide for membership; to provide for duties of the commissioner of community health; to provide for duties of the council; to provide for an effective date; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Community Health Dept.; at least two members of board shall also be members of the state health benefit plan; State Health Benefit Plan Customer Advisory Council; create

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #435 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-14HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-02-13HouseHouse First Readers
2018-02-12SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-02-12SenateSenate Third Read
2018-01-31SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-01-08SenateSenate Recommitted
2017-02-23SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-02-22SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2017-01-23SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-01-20SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback