GA SB309 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Effective Date 2023-05-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide a homestead exemption from City of Hampton ad valorem taxes for municipal purposes in an amount equal to the amount by which the current year assessed value of a homestead exceeds the base year assessed value of such homestead; to provide for definitions; to specify the terms and conditions of the exemption and the procedures relating thereto; to provide for applicability; to provide for compliance with constitutional requirements; to provide for a referendum, effective dates, automatic repeal, mandatory execution of election, and judicial remedies regarding failure to comply; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

City of Hampton; ad valorem taxes for municipal purposes; homestead exemption; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-29 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #336 (Y: 163 N: 2 NV: 11 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-23 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #272 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-01 Effective Date 2023-05-01
2023-05-01 Act 137
2023-05-01SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2023-04-05SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2023-03-29HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2023-03-29HouseHouse Third Readers
2023-03-29HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2023-03-27HouseHouse Second Readers
2023-03-23HouseHouse First Readers
2023-03-23SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2023-03-23SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2023-03-20SenateSenate Read and Referred
2023-03-16SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback