GA SB309 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 21 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to primaries and elections generally, so as to provide for the time for opening and closing of the polls; to provide that special primaries shall be conducted with special elections to fill vacancies in partisan offices; to provide for the filling of vacancies in certain offices; to amend Chapter 5 of Title 45 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to vacation of office, so as to provide for the filling of vacancies in certain offices; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Elections; time for opening and closing of the polls; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #498 (Y: 34 N: 13 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #517 (Y: 34 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-01HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-02-28HouseHouse First Readers
2018-02-26SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-02-26SenateSenate Third Read
2018-02-26SenateSenate Engrossed
2018-02-21SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-02-20SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-01-09SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-01-08SenateSenate Hopper
2017-12-06SenateSenate Prefiled

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback