GA SB306 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on August 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-05 - Veto V3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 44 of Title 43 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to speech-language pathologists and audiologists, so as to revise licensing provisions; to enter into an interstate compact known as the "Audiology and Speech-Language Pathology Interstate Compact"; to authorize the State Board of Examiners for Speech-Language Pathology and Audiology to administer the compact in this state; to provide for definitions; to provide for conditions; to provide for eligibility; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"Audiology and Speech-Language Pathology Interstate Compact"; enter into compact; licensing provisions; revise

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-20 - House - House Vote #680 (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 38) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #544 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-05 Veto V3
2020-08-05SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2020-06-29SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2020-06-20HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2020-06-20HouseHouse Third Readers
2020-06-19HouseHouse Postponed
2020-06-16HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2020-03-10HouseHouse Second Readers
2020-03-09HouseHouse First Readers
2020-03-05SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2020-03-05SenateSenate Third Read
2020-02-28SenateSenate Read Second Time
2020-02-27SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2020-01-27SenateSenate Read and Referred
2020-01-21SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback