GA SB301 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Act 130
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to authorize the City of Carrollton, Georgia, to exercise all redevelopment and other powers under Article IX, Section II, Paragraph VII(b) of the Georgia Constitution and Chapter 44 of Title 36 of the O.C.G.A., the "Redevelopment Powers Law," as amended; to provide for a referendum; to provide for effective dates; to provide for automatic repeal under certain circumstances; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

City of Carrollton, Georgia; exercise all redevelopment and other powers ; authorize; referendum; effective dates

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-31 - House - Supplemental Local Calendar: House Vote #407 (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #263 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-03 Act 130
2021-05-03SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2021-04-07SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2021-03-31HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2021-03-31HouseHouse Third Readers
2021-03-31HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2021-03-29HouseHouse Second Readers
2021-03-25HouseHouse First Readers
2021-03-25SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2021-03-25SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2021-03-18SenateSenate Read and Referred
2021-03-17SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback