GA SB301 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 20-2-261 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to minimum facility requirements for public school facilities, so as to disallow prohibitions on wood construction in public schools if in compliance with state minimum standard codes; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Public School Facilities; disallow prohibitions on wood construction in public schools if in compliance with state minimum standard codes
Sponsors
Sen. Francis Millar [R] | Sen. Earl Carter [R] | Sen. Ross Tolleson [R] | Sen. Tommie Williams [R] |
Sen. Mike Crane [R] | Rep. Mike Cheokas [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-06 - House - House Vote #715 (Y: 168 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - Senate Vote #453 (Y: 39 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - Senate Vote #453 (Y: 39 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2014-04-29 | Act 639 | |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2014-03-06 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2014-03-06 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-02-24 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-02-18 | House | House Second Readers |
2014-02-17 | House | House First Readers |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Senate Hopper |