GA SB300 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective Date 2021-06-01
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective Date 2021-06-01
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating a board of commissioners for Tattnall County, approved August 18, 1927 (Ga. L. 1927, p. 674), as amended, particularly by an Act approved April 25, 2002 (Ga. L. 2002, p. 4730), so as to change certain provisions relating to compensation and expense supplements of the chairperson and members of the board of commissioners; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Tattnall County; compensation and expense supplements of the chairperson and members of the board of commissioners; provisions; change
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - House - Local Calendar: House Vote #350 (Y: 134 N: 16 NV: 23 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #263 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #263 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Effective Date 2021-06-01 | |
2021-05-03 | Act 129 | |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2021-03-31 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-31 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-03-31 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-03-29 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-03-25 | House | House First Readers |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Senate Hopper |