GA SB3 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Act 446
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to elementary and secondary education, so as to enact the "Creating Opportunities Needed Now to Expand Credentialed Training (CONNECT) Act"; to provide for industry credentialing for students who complete certain focused programs of study; to provide for industry credentialing in individual graduation plans; to provide for the identification of certain critical and emerging occupations; to provide for a short title; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"Creating Opportunities Needed Now to Expand Credentialed Training (CONNECT) Act"; enact

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #607 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - House - House Vote #687 (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Vote #350 (Y: 129 N: 38 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Vote #351 (Y: 152 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate Vote #64 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08 Act 446
2018-05-08SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2018-04-05SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2018-03-14SenateSenate Conference Committee Report Adopted
2018-03-09HouseHouse Conference Committee Report Adopted
2017-03-30HouseHouse Conference Committee Appointed 14th, 150th, 178th
2017-03-30SenateSenate Conference Committee Appointed 37th, 50th, 40th
2017-03-30HouseHouse Insisted
2017-03-30SenateSenate Disagreed House Amend or Sub
2017-03-28HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-03-28HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-03-24HouseHouse Postponed
2017-03-22HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-02-22HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-02-21HouseHouse First Readers
2017-02-17SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-02-17SenateSenate Third Read
2017-02-15SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-02-14SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-01-23SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-01-20SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/display/20172018/SB/3
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/162953.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/165090.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/165791.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/169058.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/169613.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/169744.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/169956.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/176121.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/176576.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=14837
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=15300
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=15299
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=15979
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=16012

Bill Comments

feedback