GA SB298 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Titles 16 and 20 of the O.C.G.A., relating to crimes and offenses and education, respectively, so as to provide protections for and education to minors regarding smoking and vaping; to revise and provide certain definitions regarding the sale or distribution to, or possession by, minors of cigarettes, tobacco, tobacco related objects, and vapor products to include vapor products that do not contain nicotine; to prohibit such sales or distribution to individuals under the age of 21; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Crimes and Offenses and Education; protections for and education to minors regarding smoking and vaping; provide
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Senate Hopper |