GA SB298 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to incorporate the City of Skidaway Island; to provide for a charter for the City of Skidaway Island; to provide for incorporation, boundaries, and powers of the city; to provide for other matters relative to the foregoing; to provide for a transition period; to provide for related matters; to provide for a referendum; to provide for contingent effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
City of Skidaway Island; incorporate
Sponsors
Sen. Ben Watson [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #248 (Y: 49 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-03-30 | House | House First Readers |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Senate Hopper |