GA SB297 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-11 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-11 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 20 of Title 45 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to leaves of absence for certain public employees, so as to authorize the use of accrued leave by adoptive parents for the purpose of caring for the child after placement; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Public Employees; authorize use of accrued leaves by adopted parents; caring for the child after placement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-11 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Senate Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/47821 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20152016/155647 |