GA SB294 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective Date 2021-05-03
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective Date 2021-05-03
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating a new charter for the City of Chamblee, approved March 28, 1935 (Ga. L. 1935, p. 976), as amended, so as to change the election districts to provide for four council districts and one at-large district; to provide for terms of office; to define the boundaries of the four numbered districts; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
City of Chamblee; change the election districts to provide for four council districts and one at-large districts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - Senate - Agree To House Substitute: Senate Vote #296 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - Local Calendar: House Vote #294 (Y: 108 N: 56 NV: 8 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #215 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - Local Calendar: House Vote #294 (Y: 108 N: 56 NV: 8 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #215 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Effective Date 2021-05-03 | |
2021-05-03 | Act 125 | |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2021-03-25 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-03-25 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-03-25 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-03-22 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-03-18 | House | House First Readers |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Senate Hopper |