GA SB294 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-01 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 7 of Chapter 2 of Title 47 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to retirement allowances, disability benefits, and spouses' benefits, so as to require certain public employers to make employer and employee contributions to the Employees' Retirement System of Georgia on behalf of certain employed beneficiaries; to provide for related matters; to provide conditions for an effective date and automatic repeal; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Retirement; certain public employers and employee contributions; Employees' Retirement System of Georgia; employed beneficiaries; require

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #504 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-01HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-02-28HouseHouse First Readers
2018-02-26SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-02-26SenateSenate Third Read
2018-02-15SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-02-14SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-03-22SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-03-20SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback