GA SB293 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-01 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-01 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 7 of Chapter 3 of Title 47 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to retirement allowances, disability benefits, and spouses' benefits, so as to repeal existing provisions related to the employment of beneficiaries of the Teachers Retirement System of Georgia; to require certain public employers to make employer and employee contributions to such retirement system on behalf of certain employed beneficiaries; to provide for related matters; to provide conditions for an effective date and automatic repeal; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Retirement; employment of beneficiaries of the Teachers Retirement System of Georgia; repeal existing provisions
Sponsors
Sen. Ellis Black [R] | Sen. Jack Hill [R] | Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] | Sen. Michael Rhett [D] |
Sen. Tonya Anderson [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #502 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-28 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Senate Hopper |