GA SB288 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Effective Date 2023-05-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide a homestead exemption from City of Decatur independent school district ad valorem taxes for educational purposes for a period of five years in the amount of $200,000.00 of the assessed value of the homestead for residents of that school district who are between 65 and 69 years of age and whose income does not exceed $62,000.00; to provide a homestead exemption from City of Decatur independent school district ad valorem taxes for educational purposes for a period of five years in the amount of $200,000.00 of the assessed value of the homestead for residents of that school district who are 70 years of age or older regardless of income; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

City of Decatur; independent school district ad valorem taxes for educational purposes; homestead exemption; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-29 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #336 (Y: 163 N: 2 NV: 11 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #203 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-01 Effective Date 2023-05-01
2023-05-01 Act 128
2023-05-01SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2023-04-05SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2023-03-29HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2023-03-29HouseHouse Third Readers
2023-03-29HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2023-03-14HouseHouse Second Readers
2023-03-13HouseHouse First Readers
2023-03-09SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2023-03-09SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2023-03-07SenateSenate Read and Referred
2023-03-06SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback