GA SB287 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Intragovernmental Coordination Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Intragovernmental Coordination Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing a new charter for the City of Eton, approved March 26, 1987 (Ga. L. 1987, p. 4689), as amended, particularly by an Act approved May 12, 2011 (Ga. L. 2011, p. 4095), so as to provide for the annexation of certain territory into the boundaries of the city; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
City of Eton; annexation of certain territory into the boundaries of the city; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-15 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #211 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-03-16 | House | House First Readers |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate Hopper |