GA SB284 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Intragovernmental Coordination Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Intragovernmental Coordination Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to create a board of elections and registration for Randolph County and to provide for its powers and duties, approved May 3, 2017 (Ga. L. 2017, p. 3723), so as to expand the board from three to five members; to provide for the appointment and terms of board members; to provide for the nomination of certain potential board members; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Randolph County; board of elections and registration; expand from three to five members
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #297 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-03-31 | House | House First Readers |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate Hopper |