GA SB284 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-09 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-09 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act reincorporating and providing a new charter for the City of Trenton in Dade County, approved March 26, 1987 (Ga. L. 1987, p. 4725), so as to change the position of city clerk from an elective to an appointive position; to provide for the current city clerk to serve out the remainder of his or her term of office; to provide for the appointment of city clerks; to provide for the election of certain city officers; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
City of Trenton in Dade County; position of city clerk from an elective to an appointive position; change
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - House - House Vote #368 (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #213 (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #213 (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | Effective Date | |
2017-05-09 | Act 276 | |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2017-03-30 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-30 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-03-30 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-03-28 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-03-24 | House | House First Readers |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Hopper |