GA SB283 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-03-28 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Intragovernmental Coordination Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing for the restructuring of the governments of the City of Macon, the City of Payne City, and Bibb County, approved April 20, 2012 (Ga. L. 2012, p. 5595), as amended, so as to dissolve the Municipal Court of Macon-Bibb County; to provide for reallocation of the jurisdiction of said court; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Municipal Court of Macon-Bibb County; dissolve; reallocation of the jurisdiction of said court; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #213 (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-28HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-03-24HouseHouse First Readers
2017-03-22SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2017-03-22SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2017-03-15SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-03-14SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback